EP0504978 - Unit for the accumulation of articles transported along a horizontal path, in particular cardboard boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marchetti, Augusto Piazza Sicilia, 7 I-20146 Milano / IT | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92200688.7 | 11.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00783 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: IT MI910783 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504978 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504978 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
B65G47/261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Sammeleinheit für längs eines horizontalen Weges transportierte Gegenstände, insbesondere Kartons | [1992/39] | English: | Unit for the accumulation of articles transported along a horizontal path, in particular cardboard boxes | [1992/39] | French: | Unité d'accumulation pour articles transportés le long d'un chemin horizontal, notamment des cartons | [1992/39] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/39: Priority: 190391 IT MI91000738 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.02.1995 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3420355 (GOOD MAYNARD J DE, et al); | [A]DE2806640 (DEGOOD DAVID ALLEN); | [A]GB2018213 (DEGOOD DAVID); | [X]US4238029 (PIRRO MICHAEL S JR [US]); | [A]US4832184 (DEGOOD RANDALL K [US]); | [X]EP0320823 (DAIFUKU KK [JP]) |