EP0561061 - Twine force sensing apparatus for use on a rectangular baler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vansteelant, Marc G. Groenestraat 61 B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | 02 /
Schoonheere, Marnix J. James Ensorlaan 21 B-8480 Ichtegem / BE | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 92200743.0 | 16.03.1992 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561061 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561061 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/08 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
A01F15/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung der Kraft an der Schnur zur Verwendung in einer Ballenpresse | [1993/38] | English: | Twine force sensing apparatus for use on a rectangular baler | [1993/38] | French: | Appareil de détection de forces de fil à utiliser dans une presse à balles | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0286900 (HESSTON SA [FR]); | [A]EP0342086 (COLLOT THIERRY [FR], et al); | [A]EP0392627 (FORD NEW HOLLAND INC [US]); | [AD]EP0223351 |