EP0505009 - Pump protection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bronte Whirlpools Limited Springfield Mills Oakworth Keighley West Yorkshire BD21 1QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states Bronte Whirlpools Limited Springfield Mills Oakworth Keighley West Yorkshire BD21 1QQ / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states Bondwell Limited Springfield Mills Oakworth Keighley West Yorkshire BD21 1QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quirk, Patrick Random Cottage, Haworth Road Cullingworth / GB | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92200789.3 | 19.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | GB19910005728 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9105728 | GB19910020883 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: GB 9120883 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505009 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/00, F04D15/02 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
A61H33/60 (EP);
F04D15/0218 (EP);
A61H2033/0054 (EP);
A61H33/0087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Pumpenschutzsystem | [1992/39] | English: | Pump protection system | [1992/39] | French: | Système de protection de pompe | [1992/39] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/44] | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3640252 ; | [X]DE3408218 ; | [X]US4396353 ; | [X]US4645426 ; | [A]DE8616503U |