EP0507379 - Protection arrangement for an optical transmitter/receiver device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL BELL Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen 1 / BE | For:CH
LI
ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL BELL Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen 1 / BE | ||
For:CH
LI
ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 NL-2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | |||
Former [1996/20] | For:CH
LI
ALCATEL BELL Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen 1 / BE | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 NL-2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | |||
Former [1995/13] | For:CH
LI
BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerp / BE | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 NL-2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | |||
Former [1992/41] | For:CH
LI
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerp / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mestdagh, Denis Julien Gilles 23, rue Schuermans B-1090 Brussels / BE | 02 /
van de Voorde, Ingrid Zulma Benoit Bunderdreef 4 B-1700 Dilbeek / BE | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/13] |
Former [1992/41] | Vermeersch, Robert BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Patent Department Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 92200826.3 | 23.03.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | BE19910000303 | 02.04.1991 Original published format: BE 9100303 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507379 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507379 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/00 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
H04J14/0297 (EP,US);
H04B10/032 (EP,US);
H04J14/0293 (EP,US);
H04J14/0279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | Schutzanordnung für eine Sender/Empfängervorrichtung | [1992/41] | English: | Protection arrangement for an optical transmitter/receiver device | [1992/41] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour dispositif d'émetteur/récepteur optique | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2233851 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]); | [A]FR2598573 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US4234956 (ADDERLEY JOHN A, et al); | [A]US4071700 (HUFFMAN CHARLES E, et al) |