EP0506195 - Self-adhesive water proofing product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gelles, Richard 201 Wilcrest no. 804 Houston, Texas 77042 / US | [1992/40] | Application number, filing date | 92200836.2 | 23.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | US19910674268 | 25.03.1991 Original published format: US 674268 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506195 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506195 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, E04D5/12 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
C09J195/00 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
C08L2666/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J195/00, C08L2666/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Selbstklebendes Dichtungsmaterial | [1992/40] | English: | Self-adhesive water proofing product | [1992/40] | French: | Produit d'étanchéité autoadhésif | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.03.1995 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2440967 (ELF UNION); | [AD]EP0299499 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP0378372 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) |