EP0519528 - Transmission control module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELPHI FRANCE AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS 56/68 avenue Louis Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states DELPHI FRANCE AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS 56/58 avenue Louis Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers / FR | ||
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states ACG FRANCE 56 à 68 Avenue Louis Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers / FR | ||
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS FRANCE 56 à 68 Avenue Louis Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grange, Jean Paul 47 Avenue Andre Malraux F-674000 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1992/52] | Haines, Arthur Donald Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92201143.2 | 23.04.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | GB19910012950 | 15.06.1991 Original published format: GB 9112950 | [1992/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0519528 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0519528 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0519528 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60K20/06, F16H59/12 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
B60K20/06 (EP,US);
F16H59/0204 (EP,US);
F16H2059/006 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0239 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0243 (EP,US);
F16H2059/082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/52] | B60K20/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | Getriebesteuerungsmodul | [1992/52] | English: | Transmission control module | [1992/52] | French: | Module de commande pour une transmission automatique | [1992/52] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3237509 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]); | [A]DE3337930 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [A]FR2600285 (RENAULT [FR]); | [AD]EP0365715 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]DE3917613 (LINHART JIRKA [DE]); | [YP]DE3941665 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) | Examination | DE3735184 | DE3832971 | GB2228980 | EP0444250 | - Petersmann, J. et. al.: "Porsche Carrera 2 Tiptronic Transmission"; SAE Technical Paper Series 901760; Society of Automotive Engineers, Inc.; US; pages 11-24 | - IT-Journal: QUATTROROUTE, "Ferrari contro McLaren: duello al vertice"; 5/89, PAGES 244-245 |