EP0512635 - A process for the production of isoparaffins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sie, Swan Tiong Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92201247.1 | 04.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | GB19910009747 | 07.05.1991 Original published format: GB 9109747 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512635 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512635 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512635 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0512635 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/08, C07C1/04 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
C07C1/043 (EP,US);
C07C1/0485 (EP,US);
C07C4/06 (EP,US);
C07C9/00 (EP,US);
C10G2/33 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2521/06 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2521/12 (EP,US);
C07C2523/26 (EP,US);
C07C2523/36 (EP,US);
C07C2523/46 (EP,US);
C07C2523/75 (EP,US);
C07C2529/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/043, C07C9/00 (EP,US);
C07C1/0485, C07C9/00 (US,EP);
C07C4/06, C07C9/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/46] | C07C1/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Isoparaffinen | [1992/46] | English: | A process for the production of isoparaffins | [1992/46] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication des isoparaffines | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.1997
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Research and Engineering Company P.O. Box 390 Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US Opponent's representative Somers, Harold Arnold ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.1997
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Research and Engineering Company P.O. Box 390 Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US Opponent's representative Somers, Harold Arnold ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | 28.11.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.02.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.02.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.08.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4423265 (CHU YUNG-FENG [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,8,9 * claims 1,3-6,8-11 * * column 3, line 5 - line 45 *; | [DA]EP0147873 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] 1-4 * claims 1-10 ** example 8 * | Opposition | US3755144 | US4176053 | US4210771 | US4385193 | EP0127220 | US4522939 | US4709116 | EP0256604 | US4804802 | US4855529 | US4956521 | US5292983 | - J. EILERS et al, The Shell Middle Distillate Synthesis Process (SMDS), Catalyst Letters, 7, March 1990, 253-270 | - M. F. SYMONIAK et al, Isomerize Light Naphthas, Paper no. AM-83.57, National Petroleum Refiners' Association Meeting, San Francisco, March 20-23, 1983 | - M. F. SYMONIAK, Processing Light Naphtha: The Last Virgin, May1980 | - Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Kirk Othmer, 1978, John Wiley & Sons, pp. 544-581 | - Erdöl, Ergas, Kohle, July/August 1986, The Shell Middle Distillate Synthesis Process, M. J. v.d.Burgt et al, pp. 351-354 | - ACS Symposium, September 20, 1975, 1-27, J. Weitkamp, The Influence of Chain Length in Hydrocracking and Hydroisomerization of n-Alkanes |