EP0521541 - Chute with retarding means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERLANDE INDUSTRIES NEDERLAND B.V. Vanderlandelaan 2 5466 RB Veghel / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states VANDERLANDE INDUSTRIES NEDERLAND B.V. Vanderlandelaan 2 NL-5466 RB Veghel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Goor, Jakobus Marie Boxhornpad 6 NL-5641 WG Eindhoven / NL | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92201370.1 | 14.05.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | NL19910001171 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: NL 9101171 | [1993/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521541 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521541 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G11/20, B65G47/88, B65G1/08 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B65G1/08 (EP);
B65G11/203 (EP);
B65G47/8823 (EP);
B65G2205/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Rutsche mit Bremsmittel | [1993/01] | English: | Chute with retarding means | [1993/01] | French: | Colonne de descente munie de moyens de retardement | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.1995 | BE | 09.08.1995 | CH | 09.08.1995 | DK | 09.08.1995 | ES | 09.08.1995 | FR | 09.08.1995 | GR | 09.08.1995 | IT | 09.08.1995 | LI | 09.08.1995 | MC | 09.08.1995 | PT | 09.11.1995 | SE | 09.11.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2001/24] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
DK | 09.08.1995 | ||
GR | 09.08.1995 | ||
IT | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
MC | 09.08.1995 | ||
PT | 09.11.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
DK | 09.08.1995 | ||
GR | 09.08.1995 | ||
IT | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
PT | 09.11.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
DK | 09.08.1995 | ||
IT | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
PT | 09.11.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
DK | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
PT | 09.11.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
PT | 09.11.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
BE | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
SE | 09.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60178106 ; | [X]GB839287 (MIAG MUEHLENBAU & IND GMBH); | [X]DE1123975 (HEINR AUER MUEHLENWERKE KOMMAN); | [X]DE1135365 (MIAG MUEHLENBAU & IND GMBH); | [X]US4130193 (BOURGEOIS RONALD D); | [X]US4274527 (BAKER JOHN H); | [X]DE3500206 (BUELTMANN KG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 18 (M-448)(2075) & JP-A-60 178 106 ( TOUYOU SEIMAIKI SEISAKUSHO ), & JP60178106 A 00000000 |