EP0517331 - An installation to locate, to identify and to guard or supervise movables and immovables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1994 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veen, Egbert Brasserskade 84 NL-2612 CG Delft / NL | [1992/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/50] | Application number, filing date | 92201597.9 | 04.06.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1993/44] |
Former [1992/50] | deleted | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517331 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
G08B25/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1992/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ortung, zur Identifizierung und zur Sicherung oder Überwachung von beweglichen und unbeweglichen Einrichtungen | [1992/50] | English: | An installation to locate, to identify and to guard or supervise movables and immovables | [1992/50] | French: | Installation pour la localisation, l'identification et la sécurité ou la surveillance de dispositifs mobiles et immobiles | [1992/50] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 10.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/15] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2653581 ; | [X]GB2218243 ; | [X]EP0242099 | [X] - MACHINE DESIGN. vol. 62, no. 18, 6 September 1990CLEVELAND US pages 78 - 79; 'STOLEN CARS PHONE HOME' |