EP0525902 - Laser profiling of lens edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB IRELAND Unit 424/425, Industrial Estate Waterford / IE | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lunney, James Gerard 73 Pine Valley Avenue, Grange Road Rathfarnham, Dublin 16 / IE | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 92202308.0 | 25.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | IE19910002667 | 29.07.1991 Original published format: IE 266791 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525902 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, B23K26/00, A61F9/00 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B23K26/0648 (EP,US);
B23K26/0652 (EP,US);
B23K26/066 (EP,US);
B23K26/0734 (EP,US);
B29D11/00932 (EP,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | Profilfräsen eines Linsenrandes durch Laser | [1993/05] | English: | Laser profiling of lens edge | [1993/05] | French: | Profilage de bord de lentille par laser | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/38] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/13] | Request for further processing for: | 14.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0346116 (LRI L P [US]); | [A]EP0366356 (BAUSCH & LOMB BERMUDA TECH [BM]); | [A]EP0389217 (XAAR LTD [GB]) |