EP0527526 - Device and method for generating an oscilloscope trigger signal from a video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boelart, Eduardo c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92202368.4 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | US19910742992 | 09.08.1991 Original published format: US 742992 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527526 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527526 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/04, G01R13/30, G01R13/32, G01R13/28, G01R31/28 | [1993/07] | CPC: |
G01R13/32 (EP,US);
G01R31/2825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB [1993/07] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Oszilloskop-Triggersignals aus einem Videosignal | [1993/07] | English: | Device and method for generating an oscilloscope trigger signal from a video signal | [1993/07] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la génération d'un signal de déclenchement à partir d'un signal vidéo | [1993/07] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63283388 ; | [A]JP3019591 ; | [X]EP0393824 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]); | [Y]GB1028534 (TEKTRONIX INC); | [A]GB1315312 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP); | [A]EP0178429 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 113 (E-729)(3461) 17 March 1989 & JP-A-63 283 388 ( ANRITSU ) 21 November 1988, & JP63283388 A 19881121 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 143 (E-1054)11 April 1991 & JP-A-30 19 591 ( MATSUSHITA ) 28 January 1991, & JP3019591 A 19910128 |