EP0532100 - Benzodioxinopyrrole derivative as alpha 2-adrenoreceptor antagonist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherry, Peter Clive, Glaxo Group Res. Ltd. Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0HE / GB | 02 /
Kitchin, John, Glaxo Group Res. Ltd. Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0HE / GB | 03 /
Pipe, Adrian John, Glaxo Group Res. Ltd. Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0HE / GB | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | James, Stephen Richard, et al Glaxo plc Glaxo House Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | James, Stephen Richard, Dr., et al Glaxo Holdings plc Glaxo House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92202703.2 | 07.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | GB19910019466 | 12.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9119466 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532100 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/056, A61K31/40, // (C07D491/056, 319:00, 209:00) | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Benzodioxinopyrrolderivat als Alpha-2-Adrenorezeptor-Antagonist | [1993/11] | English: | Benzodioxinopyrrole derivative as alpha 2-adrenoreceptor antagonist | [1993/11] | French: | Dérivé du benzodioxinopyrrole comme antagoniste du adrénorécepteur alpha-2 | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/23] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB2157691 |