EP0532101 - Radio-mobile apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walters, Eckhard, c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 W-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92202705.7 | 08.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | DE19914130001 | 10.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4130001 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0532101 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0532101 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/04, H04M1/72 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04M1/725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Mobilfunkgerät | [1993/11] | English: | Radio-mobile apparatus | [1993/11] | French: | Appareil radio-mobile | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 17.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0404994 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0408024 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al); | [XP]GB2243973 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | [X] - 39TH IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE Bd. 2, Mai 1989, SAN FRANCISCO, US Seiten 729 - 734 SUZUKI ET AL. 'Signaling Protocol Architecture for Digital Mobile System' | [X] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOPSIUM 1987 Bd. 3, März 1987, PHOENIX,US Seiten 759 - 765 ROBERT ET AL. 'Alcatel Land Mobile System CD900 A fully Digital Cellular Approach using wideband TDMA' | [A] - SIEMENS COMPONENTS Bd. 25, Nr. 6, Dezember 1990, MUNCHEN DE Seiten 202 - 206 LERACH 'Systems in Silicon - the Challenge of the 90s' |