EP0534548 - Cephalostat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply Research & Development Corp. Lakeview & Clarke Avenues Milford Delaware 19963 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states Dentsply Research & Development Corp. Lakeview & Clarke Avenues Milford Delaware 19963 / US | ||
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states Dentsply Research and Development Corporation Lakeview and Clarke Avenues Milford, Delaware 19963 / US | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states GENDEX CORPORATION 901 West Oakton Street Des Plaines, Illinois 60018-1884 / US | ||
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molteni, Roberto c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Lambrecht, Jörg Thomas c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/03] |
Former [1993/36] | 01 /
Molteni, Roberto c/o Int. Octrooibureau, Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
Lambrecht, Jörg Thomas c/o Int. Octrooibureau, Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1993/13] | 01 /
Molteni, Roberto, c/o Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
Lambrecht, Jörg Thomas, c/o Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Gordon, Richard John Albert, et al Lorenz & Gordon 17, Richmond Hill London Borough of Richmond-upon-Thames TW10 6RE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Gordon, Richard John Albert, et al Lorenz & Gordon, 17, Richmond Hill London Borough of, Richmond-upon-Thames TW10 6RE / GB | ||
Former [1993/13] | Zwaan, Andries Willem INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92202882.4 | 21.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | EP19910202533 | 27.09.1991 Original published format: EP 91202533 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534548 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534548 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, A61B6/00 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
A61B6/501 (EP);
A61B6/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/13] | Title | German: | Kephalostat | [1993/13] | English: | Cephalostat | [1993/13] | French: | Céphalostat | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4088893 (SCHROEDER CHARLES H); | [X]DE8625806U ; | [X]US4759361 (GALLOP JAMES L [US], et al) | Examination | US3539805 | by applicant | US3539805 | EP0193650 |