EP0535737 - Arrangement for reproducing a digital signal from a track on a magnetic record carrier using a read head with a MR element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bombeeck, John Maria, c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92202945.9 | 25.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | EP19910202549 | 01.10.1991 Original published format: EP 91202549 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0535737 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0535737 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535737 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/09, G11B20/10 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
G11B20/10046 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (KR);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (EP,US);
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
G11B5/3922 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB [1993/14] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Wiedergeben eines digitalen Signals von einer Spur auf einem Aufzeichnungsträger unter Verwendung eines Schreibkopfs mit einem MR-Element | [1993/14] | English: | Arrangement for reproducing a digital signal from a track on a magnetic record carrier using a read head with a MR element | [1993/14] | French: | Dispositif de lecture d'un signal numérique sur une piste d'un support d'enregistrement magnétique au moyen d'une tête de lecture à élément MR | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.1997 | BE | 18.06.1997 | [1998/10] |
Former [1998/02] | AT | 18.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63182919 ; | [A]WO9102407 ; | [A]JP3106208 ; | [A]JP63276910 ; | [Y] - CARR T., WACHENSCHWANZ D., "A 107-KBPI, 16- M TRACK WIDTH RECORDING CHANNEL.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19881101), vol. 24., no. 6., doi:10.1109/20.92301, ISSN 0018-9464, page 2961/2962., XP000032127 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.92301 | [Y] - BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL vol. 55, no. 1, January 1976, NEW YORK US pages 89 - 108 M.R. CAMPBELL ET AL. 'An Algorithmic Procedure for Designing Hybrid FIR/IIR Digital Filters' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 457 (E-688)30 November 1988 & JP-A-63 182 919 ( NIPPON TELEGR. & TELEPH. CORP. ) 28 July 1988, & JP63182919 A 19880728 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section EI, Week 9110, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class U25, AN 91-073786 & WO-A-9 102 407 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES.) 21 February 1991, & WO9102407 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 299 (E-1095)30 July 1991 & JP-A-31 06 208 ( SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. ) 2 May 1991, & JP3106208 A 19910502 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 106 (E-726)14 March 1989 & JP-A-63 276 910 ( OKI ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD. ) 15 November 1988, & JP63276910 A 19881115 | Examination | - FIR/IIR Digital Filters' |