EP0524705 - Thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | ||
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishio, Taichi 2-14-34-3, Kurosuna Chiba-shi, Chiba 281 / JP | 02 /
Sanada, Takashi 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 03 /
Hosoda, Satoru 872-2 Saihiro Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 04 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 81-18, Ikaganishicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 05 /
Okada, Takayuki 1-26-24, Gohongi Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153 / JP | [1998/30] |
Former [1993/13] | 01 /
Nishio, Taichi 2-14-34-3, Kurosuna Chiba-shi, Chiba 281 / US | ||
02 /
Sanada, Takashi 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Hosoda, Satoru 872-2 Saihiro Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 81-18, Ikaganishicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | |||
05 /
Okada, Takayuki 1-26-24, Gohongi Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153 / JP | |||
Former [1993/11] | 01 /
Nishio, Taichi 2-14-34-3, Kurosuna Chiba-shi, Chiba 281 / US | ||
02 /
Sanada, Takashi 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Hosoda, Satoru 1-9, Yushudainichi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 81-18, Ikaganishicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | |||
05 /
Okada, Takayuki 1-26-24, Gohongi Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153 / JP | |||
Former [1993/04] | 01 /
Nishio, Taichi 2-14-34-3, Kurosuna Chiba-shi, Chiba 281 / US | ||
02 /
Sanada, Takashi 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Hosoda, Satoru 1-9, Yushudainichi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 81-18, Ikaganishicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | |||
05 /
Okada, Takayuki 1-13-58, Aobadai Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1993/04] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92203035.8 | 28.09.1987 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | JP19860233721 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: JP 23372186 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0524705 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0524705 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524705 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08L101/00 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L59/00 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L81/00 (EP,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,US);
Y10S525/905 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/123, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/04] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung | [1993/04] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition | [1993/04] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 13.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87308568.2 / EP0262901 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.07.1998 | FR | 22.07.1998 | IT | 22.07.1998 | GB | 22.10.1998 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/35] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
FR | 22.07.1998 | ||
GB | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/03] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
GB | 22.10.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 18.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2354368 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [Y]EP0202430 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]EP0142166 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | [XP]WO8700850 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |