EP0540081 - Time multiplexed information transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
TRT TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES 88 rue Brillat Savarin 75013 Paris / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For:FR
TRT TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES 88 rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makowski, Pierre Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92203165.3 | 15.10.1992 | [1993/18] | Priority number, date | FR19910013084 | 23.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9113084 | [1993/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540081 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
H04W88/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/18] | Title | German: | Zeit-Multiplex Nachrichtenübertragungssystem | [1993/18] | English: | Time multiplexed information transmission system | [1993/18] | French: | Système de transmission d'information selon un multiplex temporel | [1993/18] | File destroyed: | 08.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/25] | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.12.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0321672 ; | [A]US5014314 ; | [A] - PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW vol. 49, no. 3, Septembre 1991, HILVERSUM NL pages 88 - 92 XP262494 G. CAYLA ET AL 'Digital Trunked Networks; the future of Private Mobile Radio' |