EP0545449 - Trim correction circuit with temperature coefficient compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95052-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara, California 95052-8090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Archer, Donald 521 Hope Terrace, No. 2 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92203333.7 | 29.10.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | US19910794960 | 20.11.1991 Original published format: US 794960 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545449 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
H03F3/45479 (EP,US);
H03K5/00 (KR);
H03F1/301 (EP,US);
H03F3/45766 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45048 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45286 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45508 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/23] | Title | German: | Abgleichkorrekturschaltung mit Temperaturkoeffizientenkompensation | [1993/23] | English: | Trim correction circuit with temperature coefficient compensation | [1993/23] | French: | Circuit d'ajustement avec compensation du coefficient de température | [1993/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 01.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.01.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   31.01.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4618833 [ ] (RUSSELL RONALD W [US]); | US4050030 [ ] (RUSSELL RONALD W); | EP0140677 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | US4853647 [ ] (LOW MICHAEL L [US], et al) | [A] - IEEE 1988 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE 16 May 1988, ROCHESTER, NEW YORK pages 1221 - 1224 J. HASPESLAGH ET AL. 'Design Techniques for Fully Differential Amplifiers' |