EP0530930 - Motorcycle body height adjusting mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUZUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 300 Takatsuka, Kamimura Hamana-Gun Shizuoka-Ken / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOWA 14-1 Fujiwara-Cho 1-chome Gyoda-Shi Saitama-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states SUZUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 300 Takatsuka, Kamimura Hamana-Gun, Shizuoka-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOWA 14-1 Fujiwara-Cho 1-chome Gyoda-Shi Saitama-Ken / JP | |||
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOWA 14-1 Fujiwara-Cho 1-chome Gyoda-Shi Saitama-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOWA SEISAKUSHO 3-9, Nihombashi 3-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states SUZUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 300 Takatsuka, Kamimura Hamana-Gun, Shizuoka-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOWA SEISAKUSHO 3-9, Nihombashi 3-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiyota, Satoshi 11-10, Sanarudai 2-Chome Hamamatsu-Shi, Shizuoka-Ken / JP | 02 /
Machii, Tomomi 17-14, Shijimizuka 2-Chome Hamamatsu-Shi, Shizuoka-Ken / JP | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92203595.1 | 24.10.1990 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890277153 | 26.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27715389 | JP19890279961 | 30.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27996189 | JP19890281690 | 31.10.1989 Original published format: JP 28169089 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0530930 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0530930 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530930 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62K13/08, B62K25/00, B62K21/02, B62K25/04 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
B60G17/033 (EP,US);
B60G21/023 (EP,US);
B62K13/08 (EP,US);
B62K25/06 (EP,US);
B60G2202/413 (EP,US);
B60G2300/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/10] | B62K13/08, B62K25/00, B62K21/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/10] | Title | German: | Höhenverstellbarer Motorradrahmen | [1995/19] | English: | Motorcycle body height adjusting mechanism | [1993/10] | French: | Mécanisme de réglage en hauteur du châssis d'une motocyclette | [1993/10] |
Former [1993/10] | Höhe verstellbarer Motorradrahmen | Examination procedure | 27.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90311662.2 / EP0425273 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3043607 (RUFFLE LARRY L, et al); | [A]US4730838 (TAKAHASHI HIROTAKE [JP]); | [AP]DE3930966 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |