EP0544376 - Fastener for a piece having a shaft on wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPID S.A. 251 Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1993/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leon, Jean-Pierre René 41 avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-78800 Houilles / FR | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92203623.1 | 24.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | FR19910014503 | 25.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114503 | [1993/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544376 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544376 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04, F16B37/02 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
F16B37/043 (EP,US);
B62D27/06 (KR);
F16B13/04 (KR);
F16B37/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/22] | Title | German: | Befestigungselement, von einem mit Schaft versehenen Stück, auf einer Wand | [1993/22] | English: | Fastener for a piece having a shaft on wall | [1993/22] | French: | Attache de fixation d'une pièce munie d'une tige sur une paroi | [1993/22] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 29.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2913950 (TINNERMAN GEORGE A); | [A]GB907899 (RAWLPLUG CO LTD); | [A]US3426817 (PARKIN LESLIE, et al); | [A]US5036674 (CHANG DICK Y K [US]) |