EP0546637 - Electrical connection box-nut combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. Kunststoffenindustrie Attema Schelluinsestraat 68 NL-4203 NN Gorinchem / NL | [1993/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goth, Robin Schaapsdrift 66 NL-6824 GT Arnhem / NL | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Mommaerts, Johan H., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Mommaerts, Johan Hendrik, Dipl.-Phys., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 92203833.6 | 08.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | NL19910002080 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: NL 9102080 | [1993/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546637 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546637 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/18 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
H02G3/0675 (EP);
H02G3/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, NL, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Kombination aus einer elektrischen Verbindungsdose und einer Überwurfmutter | [1993/24] | English: | Electrical connection box-nut combination | [1993/24] | French: | Combinaison d'une boîte de connexion électrique avec un écrou | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7902262 ; | [A]FR2140886 |