EP0508560 - Method and device for checking coins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACT GESELLSCHAFT FÜR SOFT UND HARDWARESYSTEME mbH Köpenicker Strasse 325 D-12555 Berlin / DE | [1992/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Irsingstrasse 13 O-1193 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Hertlein, Jens, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. Otto-Buchwitz-Strasse 190 O-1142 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Seher, Eckhardt, Dipl.-Ing. Pfalzgrafenweg 42 O-1147 Berlin / DE | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Günter, et al Hübner - Neumann - Radwer - Wenzel Rechts- und Patentanwaltskanzlei Hegelplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Radwer, Dieter, et al Hübner - Neumann - Radwer Frankfurter Allee 286 D-10317 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 92250081.4 | 08.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | DE19914112106 | 11.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4112106 | DE19914139503 | 27.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4139503 | [1992/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508560 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508560 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508560 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G07D5/00, G07F3/02 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
G07D5/005 (EP,US);
G07D5/02 (EP,US);
G07D5/08 (EP,US);
G07D5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Münzen | [1992/42] | English: | Method and device for checking coins | [1992/42] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour l'examen de pièces de monnaie | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.1994 | 30.04.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.11.1997 | IT | 26.11.1997 | NL | 26.11.1997 | SE | 26.02.1998 | BE | 30.04.1998 | CH | 30.04.1998 | LI | 30.04.1998 | [2012/34] |
Former [2003/07] | ES | 26.11.1997 | |
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
NL | 26.11.1997 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
CH | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 26.11.1997 | |
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
CH | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 26.11.1997 | |
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
CH | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | SE | 26.02.1998 | |
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
CH | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | SE | 26.02.1998 | |
CH | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | SE | 26.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0245805 (AUTELCA AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2,8,12-14 * abstract *; | [Y]CH479128 (SODECO COMPTEURS DE GENEVE [CH]) [Y] 1,2,8,12-14 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR791534 (A. REYMOND) [A] 2,3,5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0213283 (AUTELCA AG [CH]) |