EP0496594 - Method for production of absorbent resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kajikawa, Katsuhiro 3-334, Toa Steel Kamo Shataku, 786, Kamae, Kama-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Masuda, Yoshihiko 14-21, Sakasegawa 1-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Nagasuna, Kinya G-406, Hamada Shataku, 931-11 Hamada, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Irie, Yoshio 1453-1, Funatsu-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300539.1 | 22.01.1992 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | JP19910005737 | 22.01.1991 Original published format: JP 573791 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0496594 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0496594 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496594 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/10 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
C08F2/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S524/916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines absorbierenden Harzes | [1992/31] | English: | Method for production of absorbent resin | [1992/31] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une résine absorbante | [1992/31] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2647364 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) |