EP0502605 - Fluorination catalyst and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1992/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, John David 3 Lindsay Walk, Cuddington Nr. Northwich, Cheshire CW8 2YQ / GB | 02 /
Watson, Michael John Flat 7, 6 Liverpool Road Chester CH2 1AE / GB | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Oldroyd, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Oldroyd, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1992/37] | Walmsley, David Arthur Gregson, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300563.1 | 23.01.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | GB19910004775 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9104775 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502605 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502605 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/26, C07C17/00, C07C17/20, C07C19/08 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
C07C19/08 (EP,US);
B01J23/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C17/21 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/21, C07C19/08 (US,EP);
C07C17/21, C07C19/12 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysator zum Fluorieren | [1992/37] | English: | Fluorination catalyst and process | [1992/37] | French: | Procédé et catalyseur de fluoration | [1992/37] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/29: Teilanmeldung 95106618.2 eingereicht am 23/01/92 | EPB 1996/29: Divisional application 95106618.2 filed on 23/01/92 | EPB 1996/29: Demande divisionnaire 95106618.2 déposée le 23/01/92 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.10.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03076853.5 / EP1350564 | EP95106618.2 / EP0666105 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Request for further processing for: | 07.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.1996 | Decision despatched | 06.06.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 23.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1307224 (ICI LTD); | [X]US3878257 (BRUCE JR JOHN MACMILLAN); | [A]US4180516 (CHANG CLARENCE D [US], et al); | [AD]GB1589924 (ICI LTD); | [X]EP0048409 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [A]WO9008755 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]EP0408005 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) |