EP0508569 - Synchro-clutching screw-and-nut mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fan, Chaolai 112 Sidalindajie Changchun Jilin 130022 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states Fan, Chaolai 112 Sidalindajie Changchun, Jilin 130022 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, Chaolai 112 Sidalindajie Changchun, Jilin 130022 / CN | 02 /
Fan, Yongjie 112 Sidalindajie Changchun, Jilin 130022 / CN | 03 /
Fan, Mengqing 112 Sidalindajie Changchun, Jilin 130022 / CN | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301117.5 | 11.02.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | CN19911001816 | 03.04.1991 Original published format: CN 91101816 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508569 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508569 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B25B1/12, B23Q5/40, F16H25/20 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
B23Q5/406 (EP);
B25B1/125 (EP);
F16H25/2025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/42] | Title | German: | Synchron-kuppelnder Schraube-Mutter-Mechanismus | [1992/42] | English: | Synchro-clutching screw-and-nut mechanism | [1992/42] | French: | Mécanisme vis-écron à accouplement synchronique | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 19.12.1996 | [1997/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3492886 ; | [X]US3007358 ; | [X]GB819506 ; | [Y]EP0354644 ; | [AD]CN1046213 ; | [A]DE2814137 |