EP0500262 - Method and apparatus for extensible inter-application link management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1992/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foss, Carolyn L. 2294 Princeton Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
Hare, Dwight F. 312 Lexington Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
McAllister, Richard F. 149 Webster Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 04 /
Nguyen, Tin Anh 304 Windchime Drive Danville, California 94506 / US | 05 /
Pearl, Amy 4010 Page Mill Road Los Altos Hills California CA94022 / US | 06 /
Shaio, Sami 630 Homer Avenue Apt. D Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | [1993/08] |
Former [1992/40] | 01 /
Foss, Carolyn L. 285 Olive Avenue Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | ||
02 /
Hare, Dwight F. 312 Lexington Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | |||
03 /
McAllister, Richard F. 149 Webster Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | |||
04 /
Nguyen, Tin Anh 304 Windchime Drive Danville, California 94506 / US | |||
05 /
Pearl, Amy 4010 Page Mill Road Los Altos Hills California CA94022 / US | |||
06 /
Shaio, Sami 630 Homer Avenue Apt. D Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | |||
Former [1992/35] | 01 /
Foss, Carolyn L. 285 Olive Avenue Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | ||
02 /
Hare, Dwight F. 312 Lexington Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | |||
03 /
McAllister, Richard F. 149 Webster Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | |||
04 /
Nguyen, Tin Anh 304 Windchime Drive Danville, California 94506 / US | |||
05 /
Pearl, Amy 1179 Nilda Avenue Mountain View, California 94040 / US | |||
06 /
Shaio, Sami 630 Homer Avenue Apt. D Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301167.0 | 12.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | US19910657159 | 15.02.1991 Original published format: US 657159 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500262 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500262 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500262 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
G06F9/543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Verwaltung von erweiterbaren Verbindungen zwischen Anwendungsprogrammen | [2000/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for extensible inter-application link management | [1992/35] | French: | Procédé et appareil de gestion de lieus extensibles entre des applications | [1992/35] |
Former [1992/35] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Verwaltung von erweiterbaren Verbindunen zwischen Anwendungsprogrammen | Examination procedure | 01.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0369961 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0380211 (LANDMARK GRAPHICS CORP [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS HYPERTEXT '89 5 November 1989, PITTSBURGH, PA, USA pages 137 - 146 A. PEARL 'Sun's Link Service: A Protocol for Open Linking' | [A] - HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL vol. 40, no. 4, August 1989, PALO ALTO US pages 9 - 17 P.S. SHOWMAN 'An Object-Based User Interface for the HP NewWave Environment' |