EP0499462 - Method and apparatus for controlling image display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Mitsuru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2,Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Takayuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2,Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301176.1 | 13.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | JP19910020667 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2066791 | JP19910020668 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2066891 | JP19910020669 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2066991 | [1992/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0499462 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0499462 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499462 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16, G09G1/02 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
G09G5/36 (EP,US);
G09G5/39 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0464 (EP,US);
G09G2360/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/34] | G09G1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Bildanzeige | [1992/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling image display | [1992/34] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour contrôler l'affichage d'images | [1992/34] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Request for further processing for: | 06.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.1997 | Decision despatched | 07.02.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 22.03.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3631329 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]FR2559933 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) |