EP0505035 - Method and device for shrouding a stream of molten metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORPORATION 10th Floor Six PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222-5479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORPORATION 10th Floor Six PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222-5479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tommaney, Joseph William 6611 Parkwood Drive Lockport, New York 14094 / US | 02 /
Martin, Gordon James 6590 Charlotteville Road Newfane, New York 14108 / US | 03 /
Bowerman, Gary Roger 6277 Townline Road N. Tonawanda, New York 14120 / US | 04 /
Buri, Reginald Charles 8460 Rochester Road Gasport, New York 14067 / US | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301227.2 | 14.02.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | US19910673704 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: US 673704 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505035 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D35/04 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
B22D37/005 (EP,US);
B22D11/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abschirmen eines geschmolzenen Metallstromes | [1992/39] | English: | Method and device for shrouding a stream of molten metal | [1992/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour protéger un jet de métal liquide | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/44] | 16.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1997/44] | 22.05.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3482621 (HALLIDAY IAIN M D); | [X]FR2013162 (ROBLIN INDUSTRIES); | [X]US3616843 (NEWHALL HENRY S, et al); | [X]GB1480944 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]GB2028196 (HAMBURGER STAHLWERKE GMBH); | [A]DE2929500 (HAMBURGER STAHLWERKE GMBH); | [Y]EP0119734 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0137118 |