EP0500305 - Method of measuring immunoreactant using electro-chemiluminescence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibue, Akira 3-22-14-208, Naka-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Masaru 2-13-15-203, Saiwai-cho Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Kamiya, Shinji 3-38-18-201, Maehara-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1992/35] | Application number, filing date | 92301295.9 | 18.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910046054 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4605491 | JP19910206336 | 23.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20633691 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500305 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500305 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500305 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/546, G01N33/533, G01N21/66, // G01N33/68 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
G01N21/66 (EP,US);
G01N21/76 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/35] | G01N33/546, G01N21/66, G01N33/533, // G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung von immunoreaktiven Substanzen mit Elektro-Chemilumineszenz | [1992/35] | English: | Method of measuring immunoreactant using electro-chemiluminescence | [1992/35] | French: | Méthode pour mesurer des substances immunoréactives utilisant électro-chimioluminescence | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.12.1996 | IT | 18.12.1996 | NL | 18.12.1996 | SE | 18.03.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1999/42] | DK | 18.12.1996 | |
IT | 18.12.1996 | ||
SE | 18.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 18.12.1996 | |
SE | 18.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 18.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9005301 (IGEN INC [US]); | [X]WO7900882 (SYVA CO [US]); | [A]EP0087564 (MILES LAB [US]) | [AD] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS vol. 128, no. 2, 30 April 1985, NEW YORK US pages 987 - 992; Y.IKARIYAMA ET AL.: 'Electrochemical luminescence-based homogeneous immunoassay' |