EP0500353 - Hemostatic clip applier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDWARD WECK INC. Weck Drive P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states EDWARD WECK INC. Weck Drive P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, John C. 4520 Briarglen Lane Holly Springs, North Carolina 27540 / US | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1992/35] | Application number, filing date | 92301377.5 | 19.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | US19910658113 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: US 658113 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500353 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Instrument zum Anbringen von hämostatischen Klammern | [1992/35] | English: | Hemostatic clip applier | [1992/35] | French: | Applicateur de pinces hémostatiques | [1992/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 09.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0409569 ; | [A]GB2128477 ; | [A]WO8302887 ; | [A]US4821721 |