EP0505038 - Improvements relating to satellite antennas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/39] | Improvements relating to television receivers | ||
[1998/51] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETACOM CONSUMER ELECTRONICS LIMITED Brentwood House, 169 Kings Road Brentwood, Essex CM14 4EF / GB | [1999/13] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states AMSTRAD PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Brentwood House, 169 Kings Road Brentwood, Essex CM 14 4EF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saward, Ian, c/o Amstrad PLC Brentwood House, 169 Kings Road Brentwood, Essex CM14 4EF / GB | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301451.8 | 21.02.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | GB19910003713 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9103713 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505038 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505038 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H01Q5/00 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H04B1/26 (EP);
H04N7/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | H04N5/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/30] |
Former [1992/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in Bezug auf Satellitenantennen | [1998/51] | English: | Improvements relating to satellite antennas | [1998/51] | French: | Améliorations concernant des antennes de satellites | [1998/51] |
Former [1992/39] | Verbesserungen in Bezug auf Fernsehempfänger | ||
Former [1992/39] | Improvements relating to television receivers | ||
Former [1992/39] | Améliorations concernant les récepteurs de télévision | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 24.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | 02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | 03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | 04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE SES Astra S.A L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf Luxembourg / LU Opponent's representative Joppich, Martin Intellectual Property Consultancy Kanalstraße Nord 216 26629 Großefehn / DE | 06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | 07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | 08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | 09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | |||
03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE SES Astra S.A L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf Luxembourg / LU Opponent's representative Joppich, Martin, Dr.-Ing. Intellectual Property Consultancy Zeppelinstrasse 71-73 81669 München / DE | |||
06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | |||
08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | |||
09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | |||
Former [2004/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | |||
03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE SES Astra S.A L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf Luxembourg / LU Opponent's representative Joppich, Martin, Dr.-Ing. Intellectual Property Consultancy Zeppelinstrasse 71-73 81669 München / DE | |||
06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | |||
08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | |||
09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | |||
Former [2003/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | |||
03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Société Européenne des Satellites S.A. L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf / LU Opponent's representative Joppich, Martin Intellectual Property Consultancy Zeppelinstrasse 71-73 81669 München / DE | |||
06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | |||
08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | |||
09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | |||
Former [2001/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | |||
03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Société Européenne des Satellites S.A. L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf / LU Opponent's representative Joppich, Martin Hössle & Kudlek Holzstrasse 26 80469 München / DE | |||
06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | |||
08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | |||
09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | |||
Former [2001/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | |||
03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Société Européenne des Satellites S.A. L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf / LU | |||
06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | |||
08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | |||
09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | |||
Former [1999/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE NOKIA MULTIMEDIA TERMINALS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | |||
03
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Grundig UK Ltd. Elstree Way Borehamwood Hertfordshire WD6 1RX / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
04
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
05
15.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Société Européenne des Satellites S.A. L-6815 Chateau de Betzdorf / LU Opponent's representative HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
06
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB Opponent's representative Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | |||
07
16.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE TechniSat Satellitenfernsehprodukte GmbH TechniPark 54550 Daun / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | |||
08
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Alps Electric Co. Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | |||
09
16.09.1999
11.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Industries Limited 5 Commerce Park, Brunel Road, Theale Reading RG7 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Naismith, Robert Stewart CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | |||
Former [1999/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
10.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 16.11.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.09.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 03.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/04] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 31.08.2001 | FR | 31.10.2002 | [2003/33] |
Former [2002/25] | PT | 31.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0190812 (SATELLITE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES [US]); | [Y]FR2591778 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0314930 (BRIONVEGA SPA [IT]); | [A]DE3832092 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y] - "NOEL 90 SATELLITE SHOPPING.", PROCEEDINGS PTC. ACCESSING THE GLOBAL NETWORK: WEAVING TECHNOLOGY AND TRADE IN THE PACIFIC, XX, XX, XX, (19901201), page COMPLETE 03., XP000669882 | [Y] - "SIEH FERN.", AVANTI, DAUN/EIFEL, DE, DE, (19900701), ISSN 0937-1613, page COMPLETE 05., XP000669881 |