EP0500399 - Chandelier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josephs, David 39 Colville Terrace London W11 2BX / GB | [1992/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verdun-Thacker, Keven 24 Broadfern Road, Knowle Solihull, West Midlands / GB | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1996/23] | Brown, David Alan, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1992/35] | Coleman, Stanley Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301517.6 | 24.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | GB19910003740 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9103740 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500399 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500399 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F21S1/06, F21V23/06 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
F21S8/065 (EP);
F21V23/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Kronleuchter | [1992/35] | English: | Chandelier | [1992/35] | French: | Lustre | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.1996 | BE | 07.02.1996 | DK | 07.02.1996 | ES | 07.02.1996 | FR | 07.02.1996 | IT | 07.02.1996 | NL | 07.02.1996 | SE | 07.05.1996 | DE | 08.05.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
ES | 07.02.1996 | ||
IT | 07.02.1996 | ||
NL | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
FR | 05.07.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
ES | 07.02.1996 | ||
IT | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
FR | 05.07.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
IT | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
FR | 05.07.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
FR | 05.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/06] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
FR | 05.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
DE | 08.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
SE | 07.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB191300416 (FISHER WILBUR HOWARD [US]); | [X]FR2300961 (LAMPADARI DI BORTOLUZZI PIETRO [IT]); | [X]US4107770 (WEBER FRANK K); | [A]FR2539215 (MIDI MOULAGES PLAST [FR]); | [A]FR2612004 (BEGHELLI G P B SRL [IT]) |