EP0505043 - A system for detecting transmission path response for television signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.1996 [1996/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iga, Hiroyuki, c/o Intell.Property Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Muir, Ian Robertson, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Muir, Ian R., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301594.5 | 26.02.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | JP19910031068 | 26.02.1991 Original published format: JP 3106891 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505043 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
H04N5/211 (EP);
H04N5/21 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Ein System zur Detektion der Übertragungsstreckeantwort für Fernsehsignale | [1992/39] | English: | A system for detecting transmission path response for television signals | [1992/39] | French: | Un système de détection de la réponse du trajet de transmission pour les signaux vidéo | [1992/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 16.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/21] | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60064579 ; | [XP]US5060067 (LEE RONALD B [US], et al); | [A]EP0328461 (FRANCE ETAT [FR], et al) | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. 36, no. 4, November 1990, pages 794-806, New York, US; J.-D. WANG et al.: "Training signal and receiver design for multi-path channel characterization for TV broadcasting" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON HDTV. SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV, II, Turin, 30th August - 1st September 1989, ed. Cselt, pages 503-509; K. NAKAMURA et al.: "An adaptive equalizer for HDTV receiver" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 201 (E-336), 17th August 1985; & JP-A-60 064 579 (SANYO) 13-04-1985, & JP60064579 A 00000000 |