EP0507462 - Prophylactic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thornton, Thomas F. 43 Contentment Island Road Darien, CT 06820 / US | [1992/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302192.7 | 13.03.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | US19910678142 | 01.04.1991 Original published format: US 678142 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507462 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61F6/04 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
A61F6/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/41] | Title | German: | Prophylaxevorrichtung | [1992/41] | English: | Prophylactic device | [1992/41] | French: | Dispositif prophylactique | [1992/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/50] | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2199968 (AKWELL IND INC [US]); | [Y]GB2100988 (TOKIWA CHEM IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]US4852586 (HAINES BERNARD M [US]); | [X]GB2220358 (STANG MICHAEL ANDREW) |