EP0508619 - Bi-directional socket stimulus interface for a logic simulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heikes, Craig 1430 Glen Haven Drive Fort Collins, Colorado / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302311.3 | 18.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | US19910684539 | 11.04.1991 Original published format: US 684539 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508619 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508619 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/60 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
G06F30/33 (EP,US);
G06F11/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/42] | Title | German: | Stimulus-Schnittstelle mit bidirektionalem Sockel für einen Logiksimulator | [1992/42] | English: | Bi-directional socket stimulus interface for a logic simulator | [1992/42] | French: | Interface de stimuli à socle bidirectionnel pour un simulateur logique | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 03.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/15] | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0406756 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 2, column 2, line 25 - line 34 * * page 3, column 1, line 44 - line 53; figures 1-2; claim 1 * [A] 4,5,8; | [A]EP0291192 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) | [A] - THOMAS, "rtl simulation makes a comeback for complex vlsi", COMPUTER DESIGN., LITTLETON, MASSACHUSETTS US, (198602), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 63 - 67 [A] 1-5,7,8 * page 63, column 2, line 14 - line 20 * * page 64, column 1, line 11 - line 18; figures PAGE,65 * | [A] - ABRAMOVICI ET AL, "system level design verification in the at&t computer division : overview and strategy", PROCEEDINGS 1989 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER DESIGN : VLSI IN COMPUTERS AND PROCESSORS, CAMBRIDGE MASS US, (19891002), pages 542 - 547 [A] 1-5,7,8 * page 544, column 1, line 4 - line 55 * |