EP0507469 - Primer for nail lacquers and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legrow, Gary Edward 1213 Wildwood Midland, Michigan / US | 02 /
Pape, Peter Gerald 6465 Water Road Sanford, Michigan / US | 03 /
Daunheimer, Scott Allen 2808 Dina Street Midland, Michigan / US | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Dowden, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1992/41] | Horton, Sophie Emma Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302351.9 | 18.03.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | US19910680481 | 04.04.1991 Original published format: US 680481 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507469 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507469 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/043 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61K8/4966 (EP);
A61Q3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/41] | Title | German: | Grundierung für Nagellacke sowie dessen Verfahren | [1992/41] | English: | Primer for nail lacquers and method | [1992/41] | French: | Composition de couche primaire pour vernis à ongles et son méthode | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2448552 ; | [A]EP0199325 ; | [A]EP0156968 ; | [AD]EP0255227 |