EP0505192 - Steam vent tube for boiling water reactor fuel assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dix, Gary Errol 15404 Madrone Hill Road Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302393.1 | 19.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | US19910672297 | 20.03.1991 Original published format: US 672297 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505192 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505192 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/328, G21C3/322 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G21C3/322 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, LI, SE [1995/40] |
Former [1992/39] | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | Dampfablassrohr für Siedewasserreaktorbrennelement | [1992/39] | English: | Steam vent tube for boiling water reactor fuel assembly | [1992/39] | French: | Tube de décharge de vapeur pour assemblage combustible de réacteur à eau bouillante | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.03.1997 | LI | 31.03.1997 | [1998/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54067877 ; | [AD]JPS5250498 (NIPPON ATOMIC IND GROUP CO); | [AD]EP0336203 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0406637 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]DE3400901 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]); | [A]DE3828616 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 93 (M-68)8 August 1979 & JP-A-54 067 877 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI ) 31 May 1979, & JP54067877 A 19790531 |