EP0506400 - Signal transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Mitsuaki, 115-3 Katsura Minamitatsumi-cho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 615 / JP | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302627.2 | 26.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | JP19910062798 | 27.03.1991 Original published format: JP 6279891 | JP19910095813 | 25.04.1991 Original published format: JP 9581391 | JP19910155650 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15565091 | JP19910182236 | 23.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18223691 | JP19920060739 | 17.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6073992 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0506400 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0506400 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506400 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/04, H04N7/12, H04N7/08, H04L27/34 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
H04L1/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04L27/183 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L27/2603 (EP,US);
H04L27/2604 (EP,US);
H04L27/34 (EP,US);
H04L27/3488 (EP,US);
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4382 (EP,US);
H04N7/045 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/21] | H04N7/13, H04N7/04, H04N7/12, H04N7/08, H04L27/34 | ||
Former IPC [1992/40] | H04N7/13, H04N7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/40] | Title | German: | Signalübertragungssystem | [1992/40] | English: | Signal transmission system | [1992/40] | French: | Système de transmission de signal | [1992/40] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/51: (deleted) | EPB 1997/51: (deleted) | EPB 1997/51: (deleted) | EPB 1997/08: Teilanmeldung 96119060.0 eingereicht am 28/11/96 | EPB 1997/08: Divisional application 96119060.0 filed on 28/11/96 | EPB 1997/08: Demande divisionnaire 96119060.0 déposée le 28/11/96 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00114691.9 / EP1049334 | EP03014240.0 / EP1359761 | EP96119060.0 / EP0766478 | EP99119266.7 / EP0975168 | EP99119278.2 / EP0973335 | EP99121006.3 / EP0975169 | EP99121007.1 / EP0975170 | EP99121008.9 / EP0975171 | EP99121024.6 / EP0975172 | EP99121025.3 / EP0975173 | EP99121026.1 / EP0975174 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0031193 (PARADYNE CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0122805 (CODEX CORP [US]); | [A]US4630287 (ARMSTRONG THOMAS [US]); | [Y]EP0311188 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]WO8908366 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [E]EP0485105 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [E]WO9214343 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, Vol.31, No.6, June, 1983, New York, US, pages 821-826; T. HILL et al.: 'A performance study of NLA 64-state QAM' | [A] - JAPAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, Vol.24, No.1, January, 1982, Tokyo, JP, pages 65-73; S. MATSUMOTO et al.: ' 200 Mb/s 16 QAM digital radio-relay system operating in 4 and 5 GHz bands' |