EP0508660 - Production of difluoromethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1992/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moore, Geoffrey James 7 Leigh Way, Weaverham Northwich, Cheshire / GB | 02 /
O'Kell, Jenny 1 Colville Grove Sale, Cheshire M33 4FW / GB | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stephen, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Geary, Stephen, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Limited P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1992/42] | Oldroyd, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302785.8 | 30.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | GB19910007677 | 11.04.1991 Original published format: GB 9107677 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508660 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508660 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0508660 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/354, C07C19/08 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
C07C17/23 (EP,US);
C07C17/389 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/23, C07C19/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/389, C07C19/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1992/42] | C07C17/00, C07C19/08, C07C17/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Difluoromethan | [1992/42] | English: | Production of difluoromethane | [1992/42] | French: | Préparation de difluorométhane | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.1996
27.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE AUSIMONT S.p.A. 31 Foro Buonaparte I-20121 MILANO / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele Sama Patents Via Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.1996
27.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE AUSIMONT S.p.A. 31 Foro Buonaparte I-20121 MILANO / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele Sama Patents Via Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | 01.03.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.08.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.09.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.09.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.07.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1206424 (HOECHST AG); | [A]EP0347830 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0379793 (ICI PLC [GB]) |