EP0508711 - Transistor direct-coupled amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohno, Masahiko, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303048.0 | 07.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | JP19910078086 | 11.04.1991 Original published format: JP 7808691 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508711 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508711 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/343, H03F1/30 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
H03F3/343 (EP,US);
H03F1/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/42] | Title | German: | Transistorverstärker mit direkter Kopplung | [1996/40] | English: | Transistor direct-coupled amplifier | [1992/42] | French: | Amplificateur à transistor à couplage direct | [1992/42] |
Former [1992/42] | Transitionsverstärker mit direkter Kopplung | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3899742 (YUM DOOHO, et al); | [A]DE1094807 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE3107581 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US3452281 (WEISCHEDEL RICHARD C) |