EP0510834 - Method and apparatus for accessing data recorded as linked lists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burke, William Theodore 920 North Citadel Tucson, Arizona 85748 / US | 02 /
Day, Kenneth Fairclough 730 North Lazy J. Way Tucson, Arizona 85748 / US | 03 /
Dewey, Douglas William 8602 East Old Spanish Trail No. 14 Tucson, Arizona 85710 / US | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1992/44] | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303126.4 | 08.04.1992 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | US19910688228 | 22.04.1991 Original published format: US 688228 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0510834 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0510834 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/419 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G06F16/9024 (EP,US);
G11B20/1252 (EP,US);
G11B27/028 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/328 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B27/024 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99956 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät, um auf Daten, die als verknüpfte Listen gespeichert sind, zuzugreifen | [1992/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for accessing data recorded as linked lists | [1992/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour accéder à des données enregistrées en forme de listes enchaînées | [1992/44] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 26.02.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02189780 ; | [A]US4791623 (DEIOTTE CHARLES E [US]); | [A]EP0389399 (IBM [US]) | [X] - OPTICAL INFORMATION SYSTEMS vol. 10, no. 2, March 1990, WESTPORT, CT US pages 87 - 89 SANDOR M.M. 'Optotech's Functional Requirements for a Volume and File Structure Standard' General, Efficient linking of structures | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 474 (P-1117)16 October 1990 & JP-A-02 189 780 ( SUZUKI FUJIYO ) 25 July 1990, & JP02189780 A 19900725 | [A] - BULLETIN OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION SCIENCE vol. 13, no. 6, August 1987, pages 18 - 20 MARLOR H. 'Data Structures for CD-ROM' |