EP0508828 - Sample observation apparatus and system, and method therefor particularly for biological samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyamoto, Shigeyuki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Ritter, Stephen David Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303257.7 | 10.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | JP19910106471 | 12.04.1991 Original published format: JP 10647191 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508828 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508828 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508828 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/01, G01N21/76, G01N21/17 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/17 (EP,US);
G01N2021/174 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1772 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0616 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/42] | G01N21/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Beobachten einer biologischen Probe | [1996/37] | English: | Sample observation apparatus and system, and method therefor particularly for biological samples | [1992/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour observer un échantillon biologique | [1992/42] |
Former [1992/42] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Beobachten eienr biologischen Probe | Examination procedure | 28.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01013457 ; | [A]WO8804045 (RUSHBROOKE JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]DE3812899 (HEIL WILFRIED [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 185 (P-865)2 May 1989 & JP-A-01 013 457 ( SHINTO PAINT ) 18 January 1989, & JP01013457 A 19890118 | [A] - TRAC, TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 9, no. 8, September 1990, AMSTERDAM NL pages 269 - 277 C.E. HOOPER ET AL: 'Quantitative luminescence imaging in the biosciences using the CCD camera: analysis of macro and micro samples' |