EP0518470 - Negative-acting thermographic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Darren c/o Minnesota 3M Research Ltd., Pinnacles Harlow, Essex, CM19 5AE / GB | 02 /
Patel, Ranjan Chhaganbhai George Green Cottages Little Hallingbury, Essex CM22 7PP / GB | 03 /
Baldock, Terence William c/o Minnesota 3M Research Ltd., Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 7PP / GB | 04 /
Stibbard, John Harry Alexender 101 Rivermill Harlow, Essex CM20 1NV / GB | 05 /
Newman, Donald John 4130 Hillaire Road White Bear Lake, Minnesota / US | 06 /
Stofko, John J. c/o Building No, 201-3N-04, 3M Centre St. Paul, Minnesota 55144 / US | [1998/24] |
Former [1992/51] | 01 /
Cooper, Darren c/o Minnesota 3M Research Ltd. Pinnacles Harlow, Essex, CM19 5AE / gb | ||
02 /
Patel, Ranjan Chhaganbhai George Green Cottages Little Hallingbury Essex CM22 7PP / gb | |||
03 /
Baldock, Terence William"c/o Minnesota 3M Res. Ltd Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 7PP / gb | |||
04 /
Stibbard, John Harry Alexender 101 Rivermill Harlow, Essex CM20 1NV / gb | |||
05 /
Newman, Donald John 4130 Hillaire Road White Bear Lake, Minnesota / us | |||
06 /
Stofko, John J. c/o Building No, 201-3N-04 3M Centre St. Paul Minnesota 55144 / us | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303824.4 | 28.04.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | GB19910009948 | 08.05.1991 Original published format: GB 9109948 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518470 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518470 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/28 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
B41M5/286 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/51] | Title | German: | Negativ-arbeitende thermographische Materialien | [1992/51] | English: | Negative-acting thermographic materials | [1992/51] | French: | Matériaux thermographiques travaillant en négatif | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.06.1998 | IT | 10.06.1998 | DE | 11.09.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.06.1998 | |
DE | 11.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/24] | DE | 11.09.1998 | |
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 06.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2355184 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [AD]GB2150702 (RICOH KK); | [Y]GB2162651 (RICOH KK); | [A]EP0403157 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [X] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURES no. 139, November 1975, HAVANT, GB pages 12 - 14; ANONYMOUS: 'Heat-sensitive copying material' |