EP0522686 - Hydrocyclone separators for separating less and more dense liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KREBS ENGINEERS 1205 Chrysler Drive Menlo Park California 94025-9928 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states KREBS ENGINEERS 1205 Chrysler Drive Menlo Park, California 94025-9928 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grieve, Donald F. 7300 Alpine Road La Honda, California 94020 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303981.2 | 01.05.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | US19910727665 | 09.07.1991 Original published format: US 727665 | US19910760590 | 16.09.1991 Original published format: US 760590 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0522686 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0522686 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B04C5/13, B04C5/103, B04C5/00, B04C5/081 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
B01D17/0217 (EP);
B04B5/10 (EP);
B04C5/00 (EP);
B04C5/081 (EP);
B04C5/103 (EP);
B04C5/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/02] | B04C5/13, B04C5/103 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | Hydrozyklone zur Trennung von Flüssigkeiten nach ihrer Dichte | [1993/02] | English: | Hydrocyclone separators for separating less and more dense liquids | [1993/02] | French: | Hydrocyclones pour la séparation de liquides suivant leur densité | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/39] | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]NL42080C (TER LINDEN) [Y] 3 * page 1, line 64 - line 84; figure 1 *; | [X]US3172844 (ANTON KURZ) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 26 - line 47; figure 1 *; | [XY]FR2362671 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 6, line 14 - line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 3,7-9; | [DY]US4702837 (LECOFFRE YVES [FR], et al) [DY] 7-9 * column 6, line 1 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2646104 (AEROQUIP CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4* page 11, line 27 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO9118655 (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]) [PX] 1,2,4,7 * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 31; figure 1 * |