EP0512860 - Double-sided optical disc player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoh, Isao 36-12 Naritahigashigaoka Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu, 572 / JP | 02 /
Fuku, Yoshihisa 6-14-C508 Sekime, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu, 536 / JP | 03 /
Takagi, Yuji 29-1-309 Deguchi 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu, 537 / JP | 04 /
Azumatani, Yasushi 6-6-206 Narita-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu, 572 / JP | 05 /
Hamasaka, Hiroshi 8-25 Koshiensudori-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken 663 / JP | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304171.9 | 08.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | JP19910105469 | 10.05.1991 Original published format: JP 10546991 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512860 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512860 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512860 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B21/08, G11B7/085 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
G11B7/08505 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G11B21/085 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/46] | Title | German: | Wiedergabegerät für doppelseitige optische Platten | [1992/46] | English: | Double-sided optical disc player | [1992/46] | French: | Lecteur de disques optiques double face | [1996/29] |
Former [1992/46] | Reproducteur de disques optiques double face | Examination procedure | 28.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01023424 ; | [A]JP02103731 ; | [A]JP01286129 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 203 (P-870)15 May 1989 & JP-A-01 023 424 ( MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUN SYST INC ) 26 January 1989, & JP01023424 A 19890126 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 321 (P-1074)10 July 1990 & JP-A-02 103 731 ( TOSOH CORP ) 16 April 1990, & JP02103731 A 19900416 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 064 (P-1002)6 February 1990 & JP-A-01 286 129 ( NTT ) 17 November 1989, & JP01286129 A 19891117 |