EP0514146 - Oriented film made of polyamide resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hisazumi, Nobuyuki 3-11-9 Minato-machi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Uehara, Tsutomu 3186-26 Oaza Shimo-Inayoshi, Chiyoda-machi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Sato, Tomoaki 18-2 Oaza Kamitamari, Tamari-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | ||
Former [1992/47] | Overbury, Richard Douglas Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304297.2 | 13.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | JP19910141405 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14140591 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0514146 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0514146 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514146 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L77/06, C08L77/00, // (C08L77/06, 77:06, 23:04) | [1994/23] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP);
C08J2377/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L77/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/47] | C08J5/18, C08L77/06, // (C08L77/06, 77:06, 23:04) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL [1992/47] | Title | German: | Orientierter Film aus Polyamidharzzusammensetzung | [1992/47] | English: | Oriented film made of polyamide resin composition | [1992/47] | French: | Film orienté à base d'une composition de résine polyamide | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0409666 (AMOCO); | [DA]JPS5662129 ; | [DA]JPS6343217B ; | [DA]JPS5129192B ; | [A]JPS58201845 | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 28, Database accession no. 81-50887D, & JPS5662129 A 19810527 (TOYOBO KK) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 38, Database accession no. 81-45070D, & JPS6343217B B2 19880829 (TOYOBO) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 76, no. 38, Database accession no. 73-71229U, & JPS5129192B B2 19760825 (TOYOBO) [DA] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840222), vol. 8, no. 41, Database accession no. (C - 211), & JP58201845 A 19831124 (MITSUBISHI) [A] * abstract * |