EP0514169 - Process for recovering N-methyliminodiacetic acid from sodium sulfate solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMPSHIRE CHEMICAL CORPORATION 55 Hayden Avenue Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states HAMPSHIRE CHEMICAL CORPORATION 55 Hayden Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02173 / US | ||
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thunberg, Jon C. 114 Mont Vernon Street Milford, N.H. 03055 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304347.5 | 14.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | US19910701285 | 16.05.1991 Original published format: US 701285 | US19910782847 | 24.10.1991 Original published format: US 782847 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0514169 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0514169 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514169 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/40 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
C07C227/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1992/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von N-Methyliminodiessigsäure aus Natriumsulfat enthaltenden Lösungen | [1992/47] | English: | Process for recovering N-methyliminodiacetic acid from sodium sulfate solutions | [1992/47] | French: | Procédé de récupération de l'acide N-méthylimino-diacétique à partir de solutions de sulfate sodique | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3808269 (BRAGDON R, et al); | [A]EP0425131 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) |