EP0514208 - Non-stinging measles-mump-rubella vaccine composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Provost, Philip J. 1680 Jacks Circle Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 02 /
Nalin, David R. 100 Lucky Hill Road West Chester, PA 19382 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304433.3 | 15.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | US19910701918 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: US 701918 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514208 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/295, A61K47/12 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K39/00 (KR);
A61K39/0015 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/165 (EP);
A61K39/20 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K2039/5254 (EP);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | Nicht-stechende Masern-Mumps-Röteln-Impfstoff-Zusammensetzung | [1992/47] | English: | Non-stinging measles-mump-rubella vaccine composition | [1992/47] | French: | Composition de vaccin non-cuisante contre la rougeole, les oreillons et la rubéole | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/22] | 06.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0028563 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]EP0065905 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]); | [X]EP0252059 (SMITH KLINE RIT [BE]) | [A] - BUNDESVERBAND DER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN INDUSTRIE E.V. 'rote liste' 1990 , EDITIO CANTOR , FRANKFURT |