EP0515179 - Optical amplifiers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kazunori No. 24-39, Kami Ootera 3-chome Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Tei, I Kou 24A Castlebrook Lane, Nepean Ontario, K2G 5G2 / CA | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Stewart Harry Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Gibson, Stewart Harry URQUHART-DYKES & LORD, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304589.2 | 20.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | JP19910143792 | 20.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14379291 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0515179 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0515179 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515179 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/16, H01S3/094 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
H04B10/2931 (EP,US);
H01S3/1001 (EP,US);
H01S3/1301 (EP,US);
H04B10/2912 (EP,US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H01S3/10015 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/48] | H04B10/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/48] | Title | German: | Optische Verstärker | [1992/48] | English: | Optical amplifiers | [1992/48] | French: | Amplificateurs optiques | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Request for further processing for: | 20.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.1998 | Decision despatched | 24.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 10.03.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56162554 ; | [Y]JP60229433 ; | [X]US3887876 (ZEIDLER GUNTER); | [A]DE3201763 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0395277 (STC PLC [GB]); | [E]EP0507367 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 47 (E-99)(925) 26 March 1982 & JP-A-56 162 554 ( NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA ), & JP56162554 A 19820326 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 82 (E-392)2 April 1986 & JP-A-60 229 433 ( NIPPON DENKI ), & JP60229433 A 19860402 |