EP0515181 - Method for preparing semiconductor member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakaguchi, Kiyofumi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yonehara, Takao, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304605.6 | 21.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | JP19910145286 | 22.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14528691 | JP19910148162 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14816291 | JP19910149303 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14930391 | JP19910149304 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14930491 | JP19910149305 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14930591 | JP19910150986 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15098691 | JP19910150987 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15098791 | JP19910150988 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15098891 | JP19910152252 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15225291 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0515181 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0515181 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515181 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/76 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/76256 (EP,US);
H01L21/0203 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02422 (EP,US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/02631 (EP,US);
H01L21/2007 (EP,US);
H01L21/76245 (EP,US);
H01L21/76251 (EP,US);
Y10S438/96 (EP,US);
Y10S438/977 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterkörpers | [1992/48] | English: | Method for preparing semiconductor member | [1992/48] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un corps semi-conducteur | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 17.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Request for further processing for: | 07.09.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.08.2000 | DK | 16.11.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | DK | 16.11.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0469630 (CANON KK [JP]); | [E]EP0499488 (CANON KK [JP]) | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. PART II vol. 23, no. 10, 1984, TOKYO JP pages L815 - L817 T. HAMAGUCHI ET AL. 'DEVICE LAYER TRANSFER TECHNIQUE USING CHEMI-MECHANICAL POLISHING' | [A] - MATERIALS LETTERS vol. 7, no. 3, September 1988, AMSTERDAM NL pages 94 - 98 L. VESCAN ET AL. 'LOW-PRESSURE VAPOR-EPITAXY OF SILICON ON POROUS SILICON.' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 57, no. 10, 3 September 1990, NEW YORK US pages 1046 - 1048 L.T. CANHAM 'SILICON QUANTUM WIRE ARRAY FABRICATION BY ELECTROCHEMICAL AND CHEMICAL DISSOLUTION OF WAFERS' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 135, no. 8, August 1988, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US pages 2105 - 2107 X.-Z TU 'FABRICATION OF SILICON MICROSTRUCTURES BASED ON SELECTIVE FORMATION AND ETCHING OF POROUS SILICON.' | Examination | - Jap. Journal of Applied Physics, vol. 28, no. 8, 1989, pages 1426 - 1443; Patent Abstracts of Japan vol. 4, no. 44, (E-005), 05-04-1980 8 6 JP-a-55016464) |